skip to content

Malavade, Tushar Suryakant

CPSO#: 96292

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Marathi, Urdu

Education:University of Mumbai, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: 4163404800 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2019 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:02 Oct 2020 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TUSHAR SURYAKANT MALAVADE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALAVADE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
AVP - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2019