skip to content

Malas, Tarek Haitham

CPSO#: 93375

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016