skip to content

Malak, Majed Mazen M

CPSO#: 94909

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHSC Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Cardiology
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2 Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:11 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAJED MAZEN M MALAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Apr 2011 to 30 May 2011
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 07 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 08 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 07 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 08 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jul 2017
EL - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021