skip to content

Malach, Jessica Hannah

CPSO#: 97553

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Village Park Paediatrics
405-27 Roncesvalles Ave
Toronto ON  M6R 3B2
Phone: 416-516-4111
Fax: 416-516-1104 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Boomerang Health
9401 Jane Street #201
Maple ON  L6A4H7
Canada
Phone: 1-888-894-2413
Fax: 905-553-8120
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jessica Malach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Malach ( CPSO# 97553 )

Business Address:
9401 Jane Street
Suite 201
Maple ON  L6A 4H7
Phone Number: (888) 894-2413

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
405 - 27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto ON  M6R 3B2
Phone Number: (416) 516-4111

Business Address:
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JESSICA HANNAH MALACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALACH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016