skip to content

Malabarey, Ola Tajuddin O

CPSO#: 95060

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Sep 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Center
Urogynecology Division
Hsc - 2F
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76252
Fax: (905) 577-8377 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Malabarey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Malabarey ( CPSO# 95060 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
Urogynecology Division
2F-49
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 1H4
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:13 Jan 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. OLA TAJUDDIN O MALABAREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALABAREY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 06 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 06 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2016