skip to content

Makki, Mehdi

CPSO#: 93825

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:St.Christopher Iba Mar Diop Col of Med, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
RVHS Rouge Valley Centenary
Department of Internal Medicine
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. Makki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Makki ( CPSO# 93825 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Connecticut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jul 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012 Active
             Dr. Mehdi Makki may practise medicine independently in Internal Medicine, only.