skip to content

Makino, Amber

CPSO#: 98128

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 May 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Holland Bloorview Kids
Rehabilitation Hospital
150 Kilgour Road
Toronto ON  M4G 1R8
Phone: (416) 425-6220 Ext. 3327 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Developmental Paediatrics Effective: 26 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMBER MAKINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAKINO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Developmental Paediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Paediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 2017