skip to content

Makhdoom, Sohail

CPSO#: 87799

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Oct 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 11 Oct 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
600 Sanatorium Road
London ON  N6H 3W7
Phone: (519) 858-2774 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

111 Waterloo Street, Suite 101
London ON  N6B 2M4
Canada
Phone: 5196726000
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

162 Chestnut Hill
London ON  N6K 4J7
Canada
Phone: 519-672-9991
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sohail Makhdoom Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Makhdoom ( CPSO# 87799 )

Business Address:
600 Sanatorium Road
2nd Floor
London ON  N6H 3W7
Phone Number: (519) 858-2774

Business Address:
800 Comissioners Road East
London ON  N6C 2R6
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
111 Waterloo Street
Suite 101
London ON  N6B 2M4
Phone Number: 519-672-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective:12 Mar 2020 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Oct 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Sep 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Mar 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Mar 2020 Active
             Dr. Sohail Makhdoom may practise medicine independently in child and adolescent
            psychiatry.