skip to content

Makh, Dalbir Singh

CPSO#: 87890

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Sep 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Sep 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of London, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
NEMS Platform 1 Practice
Station Street
Nottingham NG2 3AJ
United Kingdom
Phone: 0115 916 6061

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jul 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DALBIR SINGH MAKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAKH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 20 Nov 2007 to 04 Dec 2007
PEAP - R - Trauma General Surgery

McMaster University, 05 Dec 2007 to 07 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Trauma General Surgery

McMaster University, 09 Nov 2009 to 23 Nov 2009
PEAP - R - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2018