skip to content

Makerewich, Jacqueline Rose

CPSO#: 95433

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Piggott, Jacqueline Rose (used until: 25 Apr 2018 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
284 Queen Street East
Suite 216
Brampton, ON
L6V1C2
Brampton ON  L6V 1C2
Phone: 416-613-9335
Fax: 416-800-0354 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

1421 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5G 3H5
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

100 Front Street West
Toronto ON  M5J 1E3
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jacqueline R. Makerewich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Makerewich ( CPSO# 95433 )

Business Address:
216 - 284 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6V 1C2
Phone Number: (416) 613-9335

Business Address:
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Phone Number: (416) 484-2120

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (416) 494-2120

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 494-2120

Business Address:
100 Front Street West
Toronto ON  M5J 1E3
Phone Number: (647) 360-1975

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE ROSE MAKEREWICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAKEREWICH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jul 2017
CF - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016