skip to content

Makan, Gopal

CPSO#: 27016

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University of Natal, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Gopal Makan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 14 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital 381 Church Street Markham, ON L3P 7P3
Date Received: 29 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 06 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016