skip to content

Mak, Michael

CPSO#: 93878

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1051 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H3
Phone: 416-535-8501
Fax: 416-979-6932 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

506-1755 Broadway W
Vancouver BC  V6J 4S5
Canada
Phone: 778-379-3844
County: 
Electoral District: 

LHSC Victorial Hospital
A2-630
800 Commissioners Road East
London, Ontario
London ON  N6A 5W9
Canada
Phone: 519-685-8500
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

790 Bay St
Suite 800
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Canada
Phone: 416-837-8181
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

130 Dundas St W #3
Toronto ON  M5G 1C3
Canada
Phone: (416) 493-4242
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

250 College St
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Canada
Phone: 416-535-8501
Fax: 416-979-6932
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michael Mak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mak ( CPSO# 93878 )

Business Address:
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,- Russell Street Site Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL MAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Psychiatry

Western University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Oct 2016
CF - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015