skip to content

Majeed, Sonilla

CPSO#: 93069

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Gupta, Sonilla (used until: 08 Oct 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Jane Furber Clinic
150 Strickland Street
Lakefield ON  K0L 2H0
Phone: 705-651-5000
Fax: 705-651-5002 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Guardian Townline Pharmacy
10A-1414 King St East
Courtice
Courtice ON  L1E2B1
Canada
Phone: 9057218828
Fax: 9057218801
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sonilla Majeed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Majeed ( CPSO# 93069 )

Business Address:
B7 - 2727 Courtice Road
Courtice ON  L1E 3A2
Phone Number: (905) 233-1919

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SONILLA MAJEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAJEED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012