skip to content

Majeed, Habeeb

CPSO#: 98321

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 May 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences
Odette Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
2075 Bayview Avenue, T2-047
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-4662
Fax: 416-480-6002 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Multi-Speciality Walk in Clinic
21 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Canada
Phone: 905-897-9228
Fax: (905)-897-7780
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective:27 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HABEEB MAJEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAJEED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 15 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 16 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 10 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2017