skip to content

Majdi, Gitadokht

CPSO#: 95537

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Uptown Health Centre
Unit 8
9325 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0A8
Phone: (905) 508-8876
Fax: (905) 508-1087 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

York Medical
10660 Yonge St, Unit 2
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3C9
Canada
Phone: 905-770-9096
Fax: 905-770-4703
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

American Hospital Dubai
PO Box 5566
Dubai 
United Arab Emirates
United Arab Emirates
Phone: 9714-336-7777
Fax: 9714-4377-5500
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Arab Emirates

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GITADOKHT MAJDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAJDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014