skip to content

Maizlin, Zeev Vladimir

CPSO#: 86130

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Samara State Medical University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice address not available
Toronto ON  M9N 1X4
Phone: 416-231-6517 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Z. V. Maizlin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Maizlin ( CPSO# 86130 )

Business Address:
No business address available


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia
New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:04 Apr 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Oct 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Nov 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Oct 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 18 Oct 2012 Active
             Dr.  Zeev  Vladimir  Maizlin  may practise medicine independently in diagnostic
            radiology, only.