skip to content

Maida, Reem

CPSO#: 99658

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Dec 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Walker Family Cancer Centre
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Reem Maida Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Maida ( CPSO# 99658 )

Business Address:
Walker Family Cancer Center
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 1A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 18 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. REEM MAIDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAIDA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 10 Mar 2014 to 04 Apr 2014
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2012