skip to content

Mahoney, James Leo

CPSO#: 27917

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 Jul 2021
EXPIRY DATE
02 Jul 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 1975

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. James Mahoney Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 5 2021

Medical Records Location

Address: SRS 111 Saint Regis Cres S North York, ON M3J 1Y6
Instructions: Phone #: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 01 Jul 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Lyndhurst Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:26 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 2021