skip to content

Mahon, Michael Anthony

CPSO#: 19361

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 15 Nov 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Dec 1964

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 1964
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 16 Mar 1998
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 16 Apr 1998
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 15 Mar 1999
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 13 Apr 1999
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 14 Dec 2000
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Oct 2001
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 15 Nov 2001

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Nov 2001
Summary:

On November 15, 2001 the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Mahon's plea of guilty and found him guilty of professional misconduct and incompetence and ordered his certficate of registration be revoked immediately.

On November 15, 2001, Dr. Michael Anthony Mahon signed the following undertaking:

I, Dr. Michael Anthony Mahon, undertake to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario that I will not apply to the College for reinstatement of my certificate of registration or for another certificate of registration to prctise medicine in Ontario.

I, Dr. Michael Anthony Mahon, expressly consent to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario placing the information found in this undertaking on the public register kept under s. 23 of the Health Professions Procedural Code.

I, Dr. Michael Anthony Mahon, have read this undertaking, have been advised to seek independent legal advice, and confirm that I understand the significance of what I am undertaking to do.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 15, 2001

 

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 17 Nov 1997
Summary:

In November 1997, Dr. Mahon pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to carry out the terms of an agreement with a patient, contrary to s. 27(10); in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, contrary to s. 27(21); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 27(32). The Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Mahon(s guilty plea, and found him guilty of professional misconduct.

The Discipline Committee accepted the terms of the Memorandum of Agreement and ordered the following:

1) That Dr. Mahon be reprimanded with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register. The reprimand administered, waived right of appeal

2) That a 60-day suspension of the certificate of registration be imposed with the following conditions:

i) that the first 30 days shall commence on a date to be fixed by the Registrar. This date is shall not be less than 90 days or more than 120 days after this order becomes final.

ii) that the second 30 days of the suspension shall commence one year later, to the day, that the first suspension commences.

iii) any or all of these periods of suspension shall be suspended on proof to the satisfaction of the Registrar that full payment of $7,000.00 has been made by Dr. Mohan to the complainant.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 17, 1997

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: November 15, 2001
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Michael Anthony Mahon provided the following Undertaking to the College of Physicians and
Surgeons of Ontario (CPSO) on November 15, 2001, and consented to its entry in the public
register of the CPSO:
Dr. Michael Anthony Mahon undertakes to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
that he will not apply to the College for reinstatement of his certificate of registration
or apply for another certificate of registration to practise medicine in Ontario.