skip to content

Azarpazhooh, Mahmoud Reza

CPSO#: 108025

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Apr 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Oct 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education: Mashhad University of Medical Science, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1400 Western Rd
Siebens-Drake Building
Stroke Prevention & Atherosclerosis
London ON  N6G 2V4
Phone: (519) 931-5731 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

1005 Farnham Road
London ON  N6K 1S3
Canada
Phone: 5199142809
Fax: 5194722809
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

14987 Yonge Street
Multicare Specialty Pharmacy
Aurora ON  L4G 1M5
Canada
Phone: (905) 503-6100
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. M. Azarpazhooh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Azarpazhooh ( CPSO# 108025)

Business Address:
L H S C
University Hospital
Department of Neurological Sciences
339 Windmere Road, Room C7-002
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (613) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:01 Oct 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Oct 2015 to 06 Nov 2015
PEAP - CF - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 07 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 01 Oct 2017
CF - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Sep 2018
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2018
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 26 Apr 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Nov 2023

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Nov 2023 Active
 Dr. MAHMOUD REZA AZARPAZHOOH may practise medicine independently in Neurology.