skip to content

Mahmoud, Mohamed Ahmed Shaker

CPSO#: 85721

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Nov 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Feb 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: (519) 663-2950 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

82 grand ave w
Chatham ON  N7K 5L9
Canada
Phone: 5193526400
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. Mahmoud Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 05 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mahmoud ( CPSO# 85721 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 421-4211

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHAMED AHMED SHAKER MAHMOUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHMOUD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2006 to 20 Jan 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 21 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2007 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2008 to 30 Apr 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2009