skip to content

Mahmood, Adeel

CPSO#: 90726

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
202-323 Wilson St. E
Ancaster ON  L9G 4A8
Phone: 905 648 1878
Fax: 905 648 1879 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Adeel Mahmood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mahmood ( CPSO# 90726 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
323 Wilson Street East
Hamilton ON  L9G 4A8
Phone Number: (905) 648-1878

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Oakville Trafalgar,Memorial Hospit Oakville
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ADEEL MAHMOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHMOOD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2011