skip to content

Mahfud, Abdulaati Salem

CPSO#: 92288

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Oct 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Oct 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic

Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
700 Priestman St
Dr Everett Chalmers Regional Hospit
Emergency Department
Fredericton NB  E3B 3B7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:21 Jun 2021 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ABDULAATI SALEM MAHFUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHFUD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Dec 2009 to 27 Jan 2010
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 28 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Nov 2013
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2021