skip to content

Maheshwari, Anil Kumar

CPSO#: 91425

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Jun 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2022

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education: Univ of Med & Dentistry of New Jersey, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grandview Medical Centre
Family Health Team
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 3H7
Phone: (519) 623-4200 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cleveland Clinic Canada
Brookfield Place
181 Bay Street
Suite 3000
Toronto ON  M5J 2T3
Canada
Phone: 416-507-6600
Fax: 416-507-6610
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Monkhouse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 17 2017
Corporation Name: Anil Maheshwari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Maheshwari ( CPSO# 91425 )

Business Address:
Grandview Medical Centre
Family Health Team
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 3H7
Phone Number: (519) 623-4200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:07 Oct 2021 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANIL KUMAR MAHESHWARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHESHWARI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jun 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Oct 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 24 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2022