skip to content

Mahe, Etienne Raymond

CPSO#: 91170

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Foothills Medical Centre 6th Floor 1403 29 Street Northwest Calgary, AB T2N 2T9
Date Received: 27 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 15 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 16 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015