skip to content

Mahdavian, Masoud

CPSO#: 94165

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:Arak University of Medical Sciences, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
370 Bayview Drive, Suite 118
Barrie ON  L4N 7L3
Phone: 705-735-4682
Fax: 705-735-4684 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

17730 Leslie Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y3E4
Canada
Fax: 905-898-2220
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Royal Victoria Hospital (RVH)
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
Phone: 705-728-9090
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mahdavian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mahdavian ( CPSO# 94165 )

Business Address:
200-370 Bayview Drive
Barrie ON  L4N 7L3
Phone Number: (705) 315-2801

Business Address:
17730 Leslie Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3E4

Business Address:
12-9080 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:06 Nov 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MASOUD MAHDAVIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHDAVIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 06 Jul 2010 to 14 Sep 2010
PEAP - CF - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 15 Sep 2010 to 29 Jun 2011
CF - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 10 Apr 2012 to 06 May 2012
EL - Respiratory Medicine

University of Ottawa, 06 May 2013 to 02 Jun 2013
EL - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015