skip to content

Maharaj, Amishanker

CPSO#: 20870

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Cape Town, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: The Albany Clinic Mr. James Higginson-Rawlins Tel: (416) 461-9471 ext. 5470
Date Received: 02 Jun 2011

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2011