skip to content

Magyarody, Nora

CPSO#: 100269

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto West Medical
Suite 1
523 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M8Y 1J7
Phone: (416) 760-8367 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NORA MAGYARODY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAGYARODY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 31 May 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2016