skip to content

Magwood, Kathleen Ildiko Melinda

CPSO#: 19768

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2002
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2002

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2002