skip to content

Maggisano, Robert

CPSO#: 27543

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Jul 1975
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2075 Bayview Avenue
H Wing 1st Floor Room 185
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4737
Fax: (416) 480-5815 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 200
4600 Highway #7
Woodbridge ON  L4L 4Y7
Canada
Phone: (905) 850-2991
Fax: (905) 850-6045
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Robert Maggisano Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Maggisano ( CPSO# 27543 )

Business Address:
200 - 4600 Highway 7
Woodbridge ON  L4L 4Y7
Phone Number: (905) 850-2991

Business Address:
H1-165 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4737

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 14 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 25 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERT MAGGISANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAGGISANO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1975