skip to content

Madej, Ursula Halina Zenobia

CPSO#: 97807

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Calgary, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7373
Fax: (905) 472-7535 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

4800 leslie st, suite 310
Toronto ON  M2J 2K9
Canada
Phone: (416) 492-5888
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Madej Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. U. Madej ( CPSO# 97807 )

Business Address:
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7373

Business Address:
310-4800 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2J 2K9
Phone Number: (416) 492-5888

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. URSULA HALINA ZENOBIA MADEJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MADEJ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016