skip to content

Madan, Pooja

CPSO#: 95052

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Oct 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 31 Oct 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Saint James School of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2311 N. Prospect Avenue
Milwaukee WI  53211
United States
Phone: (414) 319-3000

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Pooja Madan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 29 2019

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Wisconsin

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:31 Oct 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
EL - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Apr 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2014 Active
             Dr. Pooja Madan may practise medicine independently in family medicine, only.