skip to content

Macritchie, Kenneth John

CPSO#: 32089

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Apr 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Apr 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gaelic

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Sheppard Clinic 649 Sheppard Avenue West Toronto, Ontario M3H 2S4 Tel: (416) 630-0610 Fax: (416) 398-5712
Date Received: 15 Apr 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:29 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Nov 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Apr 2013