skip to content

Macrae, Carey Gordon

CPSO#: 25113

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 07 Dec 1995
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Dec 1995
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1972
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 07 Dec 1995

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 23 Nov 1994
Summary:

 In November 1994, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Macrae guilty of professional misconduct, in 
 that he committed sexual impropriety with a patient.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. 
 Macrae be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.  The 
 Committee also ruled that his licence to practice be revoked.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 28 Jun 1996
Hearing Date(s): Oct 04, 1993