skip to content

Macniven, Frank Malcolm Stewart

CPSO#: 20550

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Date of Death: 8-May-2010

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010