skip to content

Macleod, Eric Campbell

CPSO#: 19808

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jan 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jan 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 126 Hyland Drive Sudbury, ON P3E 1R6
Date Received: 07 Dec 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2016