Maclellan, Merry Joan Elizabeth (CPSO#: 100676)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Citrus Medical
2240 Lakeshore Blvd, unit 107
Toronto ON  M8V 0B1
Phone: 416-800-6500
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MERRY JOAN ELIZABETH MACLELLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACLELLAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2015 to 13 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015