skip to content

Maclellan, John Archibald

CPSO#: 23339

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Jul 1984
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1961
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Oct 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jul 1984