skip to content

Mackie, Carl Clarence

CPSO#: 28039

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Jun 1974

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: C.C. Mackie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Mackie ( CPSO# 28039 )

Business Address:
281 Stone Road East
Guelph ON  N1G 5J5
Phone Number: (519) 823-5133

Medical Records Location

Address: The Arbour Medical Centre 281 Stone Rd. E. Guelph, ON N1G 5J5
Date Received: 05 Jun 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020