skip to content

Mackey, Shannon Richard

CPSO#: 93691

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Dec 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Dec 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
95 Bonaventure Ave
St. John's NL  A1B 2X5
Phone: 6476133448

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS Document Storage 1-888-563-3732
Instructions: Contact after July 15 to obtain records
Date Received: 15 Jun 2017


Instructions: Patients wishing to obtain copies of their medical records should contact Dr. Mackey at 647-344-4553
Date Received: 19 Jun 2014


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Northwest Territories

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHANNON RICHARD MACKEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 2020