skip to content

Mackenzie, Robert Arthur

CPSO#: 19725

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 27 Sep 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Nuclear Medicine Department London Health Sciences Centre Phone: 519-685-8500 St Joseph's Health Care London PO Box 5777, Stn B London, ON N6A 4V2 Woodstock General Hospital 310 Juliana Dr Woodstock, ON N4V 0A4 Phone: 519-421-4211
Date Received: 01 Jun 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:05 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective:21 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1965
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 May 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 02 Aug 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018