skip to content

Mackenzie, Ewen James Macdonald

CPSO#: 30813

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ewen Mackenzie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 1 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1978 to 14 Jun 1979
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 11 Feb 2002 to 10 May 2002
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016