skip to content

Mackay, Ian Earl

CPSO#: 97033

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Nov 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:28 Feb 2007 CFPC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective:24 Sep 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2013