skip to content

Mackay, Harold Vernon

CPSO#: 16941

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jul 2003
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 04 Jul 2003

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1958
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Sep 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jul 2003