skip to content

Maciver, Angus Graham

CPSO#: 30719

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Feb 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 1979
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Line 16 Perth S
911 Number 4759
R R 7
St Marys ON  N4X 1C9
Phone: (519) 393-5579 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Angus Maciver Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Maciver ( CPSO# 30719 )

Business Address:
4759 Line 16
Perth South, RR #7
St Marys ON  N4X 1C9
Phone Number: (519) 393-5579

Business Address:
19 Hospital Drive
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Phone Number: (705) 658-4544


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Northwest Territories
Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:13 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANGUS GRAHAM MACIVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACIVER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1979
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 25 Jan 2020
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 25 Feb 2020

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Jan 2020
Summary:

On January 24, 2020, on the basis of agreed facts and admission, the Discipline 
 Committee (the “Committee”) of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario 
found that Dr. Angus Graham Maciver committed an act of professional misconduct, 
and set out its penalty and costs order with written reasons to follow.  

FACTS 

Dr. Maciver is a 70-year-old general surgeon practising in St. Mary’s, Ontario. He has 
held a certificate of registration authorizing independent practice since 1979. 

At the time of the incidents described below, Dr. Maciver held the position of Past 
President of the Perth County Medical Society, a section of the Ontario Medical 
Association (“OMA”). He has also acted as an Assessor for the College of Physicians 
 and Surgeons’ Quality Assurance and Out of Hospital Premises programs. The OMA is 
 the association that represents the political and economic interests of physicians in 
 Ontario. This includes representing Ontario physicians in negotiations with the Province 
 of Ontario. 

 Concerned Ontario Doctors (“COD”) is a physician advocacy organization that has taken 
 positions critical of the OMA. At the relevant times, Dr. Kulvinder Kaur Gill (“Dr. Gill”) and 
 Dr. Ashvinder Kaur Lamba (“Dr. Lamba”) were Board Directors of COD. 

 Twitter Posts of September 2018 

 On September 4, 2018, Dr. Maciver engaged in an exchange on Twitter relating to COD’s 
 advocacy regarding the OMA. In the course of this exchange, Dr. Maciver tweeted the 
 following, referring specifically to Dr. Gill and Dr. Lamba: “The effing best is that these 
 overpaid but whining corksoakers still have me on their list but have effing blocked 
 me…the Ash and Kulvinder twats...”. [10:04PM]. The tweet was later deleted by Dr. 
 Maciver. 

 After posting this, Dr. Maciver posted further tweets referring to Dr. Gill and Dr. Lamba, 
 including the following: 

             “I think [F], that I’m dead to them. I’m ok debating, but the blocking shit 
             showcases their histrionic selfishness.” [10:26PM] 

             “and BTFW, this also showcases their lack of the qualities we all expect in 
             a physician, let alone a colleague” [10:29PM] 

             “Never said anything at all against either of them personally until this last 
             tweet. They are intolerant, or why would they block a colleague?” 
             [11:03PM] 
             “I’m not holding my breath, [P]. Saw them perform at OMA council. They 
             are an intolerant bunch…” [11:11PM] 
  
 Also on September 4, in an exchange discussing OMA fee negotiations and relativity 
 between specialties, Dr. Maciver tweeted that a coalition of physician specialities 
 should be named “Poor Sluts”. This was in reply to a message from another user who 
 joked that the coalition should be named Poor-Sod, for “Pissed Off Over-Regulated 
 Shortchanged Ontario Doctors”. Dr. Maciver replied: “Or Poor Sluts, as they’d say in 
 Cape Breton ….. Serially Leftbehind Underpaid Trench Slaves” [7:24PM] 
   
 On September 7 and 8, 2018, Dr. Maciver posted further tweets regarding Dr. Gill and Dr. 
 Lamba. He mentioned an attempt to apologize, but in so doing criticized Dr. Gill and Dr. 
 Lamba for blocking him on Twitter and preventing constructive discussion: “Hi [T]. I 
 specified that the phrase was not gender focused in an immediate follow up. The 
 phrase itself is succinct. Google it. These people had previously blocked me when I had 
 objected to their lack of constructivity in their complaints.” [September 7] 
   
 “Again, I’m quite happy to apologize to Drs. Kaur, and gender issues were not intended. 
 Their attitude with blocking everyone who disagrees with them prevents constructive 
 discussion.” [September 8, 10:17AM] 
   
 “I apologized to them unconditionally earlier today but I don’t know if they received the 
 email as I am blocked by them.” [September 8, 6:25PM] 
        
 “I again apologize for the poor choice of words used in a recent tweet, despite 
 clarification and deleting the tweet with 2 subsequent apologies.” [September 8, 
11:05PM] 
 
Dr. Gill and Dr. Lamba indicated that prior to these tweets being posted by Dr. Maciver, 
they had never spoken to or interacted with him in their personal or professional lives, 
either in person or on any social media platform. 
 
FACTS ON PENALTY 
 
On March 21-23, 2019, Dr. Maciver completed the PROBE Program on Professional and 
Problem-Based Ethics. Dr. Maciver’s PROBE Essay, the PROBE Evaluation and 
 Assessment Report and the Certificate of Completion were attached to an exhibit and 
were before the Committee.   
  
 DISPOSITION 
  
 On January 24, 2020, the Discipline Committee ordered that: 
 
    -  The Registrar suspend Dr. Maciver’s certificate of registration for a period of one (1) 
       month, commencing from January 25, 2020 at 12:01 a.m.  
-      
      Dr. Maciver attend before the panel to be reprimanded.  
-      
-     Dr. Maciver pay costs to the College in the amount $6,000.00 within 30 days of the 
      date of the Order.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): January 24, 2020 9:00 a.m. - 12:00 p.m.