skip to content

Macintyre, John Dugald

CPSO#: 28362

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: Macintyre, John Douglas (used until: 03 Nov 1983 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John D. MacIntyre Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Macintyre ( CPSO# 28362 )

Business Address:
15-B - 115 Hamilton Street North
Waterdown ON  L8B 1A8
Phone Number: (905) 690-1670

Medical Records Location

Address: Parkside Medical Clinic 15B-115 Hamilton St N Waterdown ON L8B 1A8
Date Received: 01 May 2019

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1976
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Dec 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jul 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019