skip to content

Macintosh, Frank Douglas

CPSO#: 27227

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Aug 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Sep 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2017