skip to content

Macgregor, Daune Lorine

CPSO#: 25020

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Aug 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5668
Fax: (416) 813-6334 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Duane L. MacGregor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Macgregor ( CPSO# 25020 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8

Business Address:
1849 Yonge Street
Suite 204
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y4
Phone Number: (905) 273-7874

Business Address:
1728-111 St Clair Ave W
Toronto ON  M4V 1N5
Phone Number: 4162582384

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective:30 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAUNE LORINE MACGREGOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACGREGOR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1977