skip to content

Macgillis, Murray Joseph

CPSO#: 31964

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Sep 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Sep 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone: (613) 345-5645
Fax: (613) 659-2871 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Macgillis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Macgillis ( CPSO# 31964 )
Dr. D. Macgillis ( CPSO# 54538 )

Business Address:
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-5645

Business Address:
Kingston Laser and Cosmetic Clinic
Clock Tower Plaza
863 Norwest Road
Unit 1
Kingston ON  K7P 2N2
Phone Number: (613) 384-4200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
St Vincent de Paul Hospital,Providence Continuing Care Centre Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:22 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MURRAY JOSEPH MACGILLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACGILLIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1980

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: August 9, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)