skip to content

Macdonald, Elinor Athen

CPSO#: 32320

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2022
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 May 1981

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: C. Macdonald & E.A. Macdonald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Macdonald ( CPSO# 32320 )
Dr. C. Macdonald ( CPSO# 33798 )

Business Address:
No business address available

 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Almost all my records are electronic and stored at Kingston Health Sciences centre.
Date Received: 31 May 2022

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:20 May 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2022